Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3653 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17059 Week
» 70075 Month
» 189602 Year
» 3216455 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
160 |
m/e |
07/1919 |
Great Western Railway |
382 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Nasmyth Wilson |
To Service |
During 07/1919 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 26/04/1956 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys |
Total Mileage |
830,988 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1919 |
CV.BRY |
|
Barry |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/04/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
30/04/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
23/09/1956 |
Swindon Works |
On Works were noted the following : 92089, complete, no shed plate; 92088, 92090, almost complete, numbers chalked on; 6848 'Toddington Grange' painted green and lined out; 6029 just out, without double chimney; 316, 382, 399 being groken up. |
SLS/195611 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1919 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 160 Built at Nasmyth Wilson |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 382 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barry (CV.BRY) |
|
|
26/04/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 382 |
|
|
06/10/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|