Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 34 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4011 Week
» 15248 Month
» 248168 Year
» 1913544 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 160 m/e 07/1919
Great Western Railway 382 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Nasmyth Wilson
To Service During 07/1919
Withdrawal Thu 26/04/1956
Service Life 36 yrs, 9 mths , 27 dys
Total Mileage 830,988

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 06/10/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1919
     Withdrawn on 26/04/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 30/04/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/09/1956 Swindon Works On Works were noted the following : 92089, complete, no shed plate; 92088, 92090, almost complete, numbers chalked on; 6848 'Toddington Grange' painted green and lined out; 6029 just out, without double chimney; 316, 382, 399 being groken up. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 160
Built at Nasmyth Wilson
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 382    
26/04/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 382    
06/10/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev