Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 624 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 3949 Week
» 3949 Month
» 70811 Year
» 1736187 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 162 m/e 05/1920
Great Western Railway 383 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 05/1920
Withdrawal Mon 12/08/1957
Service Life 37 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys
Total Mileage 797,402

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 02/11/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1920
88E   Abercynon 8w/e 20/04/1957
     Withdrawn on 12/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   m/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 162
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 383    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
12/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 383    
02/11/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev