Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 702 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14108 Week
» 67124 Month
» 186651 Year
» 3213504 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
162 |
m/e |
05/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
383 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 05/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/08/1957 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys |
Total Mileage |
797,402 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1920 |
CHYS |
|
Cardiff Cathays |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
88E |
|
Abercynon |
8w/e |
20/04/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
12/08/1957 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/08/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 162 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 383 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
20/04/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
12/08/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 383 |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|