Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1255 Week
» 8867 Month
» 75729 Year
» 1741105 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 164 m/e 06/1920
Great Western Railway 384 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 06/1920
Withdrawal Mon 13/02/1956
Service Life 35 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys
Total Mileage 799,754

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 21/04/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1920
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 30/01/1954
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
     Withdrawn on 13/02/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   m/e 29/02/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 164
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 384    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
13/02/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 384    
21/04/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev