Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 20 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 3997 Week
» 15234 Month
» 248154 Year
» 1913530 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 165 m/e 06/1920
Great Western Railway 385 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 06/1920
Withdrawal Mon 01/04/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy
Total Mileage 656,383

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 18/05/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1920
86J   Aberdare 4w/e 14/06/1952
86J   Aberdare 6w/e 30/06/1952
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 21/02/1953
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/05/1954
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 09/10/1954
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 24/03/1956
     Withdrawn on 01/04/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 22/05/1954
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 24/03/1956
WDN   m/e 30/04/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 165
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 385    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
22/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
01/04/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 385    
18/05/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev