Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 25 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4002 Week
» 15239 Month
» 248159 Year
» 1913535 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 400 m/e 06/1920
Great Western Railway 386 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 06/1920
Withdrawal Fri 27/04/1956
Service Life 35 yrs, 10 mths , 27 dys
Total Mileage 857,104

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 16/06/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1920
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 22/04/1950
     Withdrawn on 27/04/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 22/04/1950
WDN   m/e 30/04/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 400
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 386    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
27/04/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 386    
16/06/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev