Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 72 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 72 Week
» 26693 Month
» 26693 Year
» 1692069 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 401 m/e 07/1920
Great Western Railway 387 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 07/1920
Withdrawal Mon 05/11/1956
Total Mileage 850,566
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 29/12/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1920
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/04/1956
   Withdrawn on 05/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 21/04/1956
WDN   m/e 30/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 401
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 387    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
05/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 387    

prev prev