Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 36 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4013 Week
» 15250 Month
» 248170 Year
» 1913546 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 402 m/e 08/1920
Great Western Railway 388 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 08/1920
Withdrawal Mon 01/10/1956
Service Life 36 yrs, 2 mths , 0 dys
Total Mileage 782,915

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 20/04/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1920
RHY   Rhymney 4w/e 29/01/1949
88C   Barry 4w/e 15/07/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays m/e 16/06/1956
     Withdrawn on 01/10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 15/07/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 19/05/1956
WDN   m/e 31/10/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 402
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 388    
29/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
15/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
16/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
01/10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 388    
20/04/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev