Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 189 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 1280 Week
» 8892 Month
» 75754 Year
» 1741130 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 404 m/e 09/1920
Great Western Railway 390 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 09/1920
Withdrawal Mon 26/08/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys
Total Mileage 668,888

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 30/11/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1920
88C   Barry 4w/e 25/11/1953
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 11/08/1956
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/01/1957
88E   Abercynon 8w/e 20/04/1957
     Withdrawn on 26/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 11/08/1956
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 23/03/1957
WDN   m/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1948 Caerphilly Works On 2/4 the following locomotives were noted in the Erecting Shop:-Nos. 64, 72, 270, 320/21, 390, 3103/89, 3712, 4134, 4256/63/93/98, 4404, 5114, 5223, 5635/58/68/80, 6661 an 8796, while outside were observed Nos. 190, 3178, 4238/52, 5219, 5549 an 5649. SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 404
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 390    
25/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
26/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
26/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 390    
30/11/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev