Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 504 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5979 Week
» 5979 Month
» 72841 Year
» 1738217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 406 m/e 11/1920
Great Western Railway 393 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 11/1920
Withdrawal Mon 13/05/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys
Total Mileage 731,608

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 15/06/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1920
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/01/1952
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 29/02/1952
88C   Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 11/08/1956
     Withdrawn on 13/05/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 11/08/1956
WDN   m/e 31/05/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1948 General Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' SLS/194805

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1920 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 406
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 393    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
29/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
11/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
13/05/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 393    
15/06/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev