Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2657 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16063 Week
» 69079 Month
» 188606 Year
» 3215459 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
406 |
m/e |
11/1920 |
Great Western Railway |
393 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Hawthorn Leslie |
To Service |
During 11/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 13/05/1957 |
Service Life |
36 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys |
Total Mileage |
731,608 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
88D |
Merthyr Tydfil |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1948 |
General |
Further locomotives noted carrying the prefix 'W' with blank tanks or tender sides were:-Nos. 33, 216/63, 393, 1141, 1993, 2048, 5388, 5625, 6703, 7751/68, while those lettered 'British Railways' were:-Nos. 361, 3103, 4217, 4533, 5035/99, 5257, 5520, 5641/52/55 an 6964. Nos. 271, 4206 an 5958 had been prefixed, but still carried 'G.W.R.' |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 406 Built at Hawthorn Leslie |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 393 |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
29/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D) |
|
|
03/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
13/05/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 393 |
|
|
15/06/1957 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|