Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 624 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1640 Week
» 19692 Month
» 252612 Year
» 1917988 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 409 m/e 01/1921
Great Western Railway 398 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 01/1921
Withdrawal Tue 13/08/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys
Total Mileage 623,646
Information Mileage since rebuild in 1925

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 28/12/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1921
     Withdrawn on 13/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney 4w/e 04/10/1947
WDN   m/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 409
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 398    
13/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 398    
28/12/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev