Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 34 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4011 Week
» 15248 Month
» 248168 Year
» 1913544 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 412 m/e 02/1921
Great Western Railway 402 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (1947) 304 on 10/03/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 02/1921
Withdrawal Mon 12/08/1957
Service Life 36 yrs, 6 mths , 12 dys
Total Mileage 661,941

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 05/10/1957 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1921
     Withdrawn on 12/08/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   m/e 31/08/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 412
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 402    
10/03/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 304    
12/08/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 304    
05/10/1957 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev