Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 691 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1707 Week
» 19759 Month
» 252679 Year
» 1918055 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 415 m/e 12/1921
Great Western Railway 406 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (1947) 307 on 13/07/1949 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 12/1921
Withdrawal Tue 13/03/1956
Service Life 34 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys
Total Mileage 656,231

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 11/08/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1921
58   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 03/11/1945
88E   Abercynon 8w/e 26/03/1955
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/04/1955
     Withdrawn on 13/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CYS   4w/e 03/11/1945
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 23/04/1955
WDN   m/e 31/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 415
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 406    
03/11/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (58)    
13/07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 307    
26/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
13/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 307    
11/08/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev