Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1817 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15223 Week
» 68239 Month
» 187766 Year
» 3214619 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
415 |
m/e |
12/1921 |
Great Western Railway |
406 |
y/e |
1924 |
Great Western Railway (1947) |
307 |
on |
13/07/1949 (At Caerphilly Factory) |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Cameron |
Class |
A |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
To Service |
During 12/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 13/03/1956 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys |
Total Mileage |
656,231 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CYS |
|
4w/e |
03/11/1945 |
ALLOC |
88E |
Abercynon |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/03/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 415 Built at Vulcan Foundry |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 406 |
|
|
03/11/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Cathays (CHYS) |
|
|
13/07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 307 |
|
|
26/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Abercynon (88E) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A) |
|
|
13/03/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 307 |
|
|
11/08/1956 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|