Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 43 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4020 Week
» 15257 Month
» 248177 Year
» 1913553 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 416 m/e 12/1921
Great Western Railway 408 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (1947) 308 on 03/12/1948 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
To Service During 12/1921
Withdrawal Mon 19/12/1955
Service Life 34 yrs , 19 dys
Total Mileage 641,754

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sun 26/02/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1921
88B   Cardiff East Dock m/e 19/06/1954
     Withdrawn on 19/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 19/06/1954
WDN   m/e 31/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1921 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 416
Built at Vulcan Foundry
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 408    
03/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 308    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
19/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 308    
26/02/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev