Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 42 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4019 Week
» 15256 Month
» 248176 Year
» 1913552 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 3 m/e 10/1914
Great Western Railway 438 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (1947) 309 on 17/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Hawthorn Leslie
To Service During 10/1914
Withdrawal Mon 16/02/1953
Service Life 38 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1914
     Withdrawn on 16/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SED Swansea East Dock 4w/e 19/04/1947
WDN   m/e 28/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1914 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 3
Built at Hawthorn Leslie
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 438    
17/06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 309    
16/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 309    

prev prev