Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 136 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 136 Week
» 19037 Month
» 19037 Year
» 1684413 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 42 m/e 08/1915
Great Western Railway 439 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (1947) 312 on 22/09/1949 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 08/1915
Withdrawal Mon 11/06/1956
Total Mileage 881,057
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 03/11/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 11 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1915
88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/01/1955
88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
   Withdrawn on 11/06/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 29/01/1955
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 08/10/1955
WDN   m/e 30/06/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1915 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 42
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 439    
22/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 312    
29/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
11/06/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 312    

prev prev