Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 43 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4020 Week
» 15257 Month
» 248177 Year
» 1913553 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 52 m/e 08/1915
Great Western Railway 440 y/e 1924
Great Western Railway (1947) 316 on 15/06/1950 (At Caerphilly Factory)

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Cameron
Class A
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
To Service During 08/1915
Withdrawal Mon 23/07/1956
Service Life 40 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys
Total Mileage 828,608

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 06/10/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1915
RHY   Rhymney on 14/10/1948
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 12/08/1950
     Withdrawn on 23/07/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RHY Rhymney on 14/10/1948
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   m/e 31/07/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
23/09/1956 Swindon Works On Works were noted the following : 92089, complete, no shed plate; 92088, 92090, almost complete, numbers chalked on; 6848 'Toddington Grange' painted green and lined out; 6029 just out, without double chimney; 316, 382, 399 being groken up. SLS/195611

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1915 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 52
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 440    
14/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
15/06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 316    
12/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
23/07/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 316    
06/10/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev