Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2823 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16229 Week
» 69245 Month
» 188772 Year
» 3215625 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1311 |
m/e |
03/1898 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4311 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) |
2128 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
62128 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
207 |
Works Number |
759 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 03/1898 |
Withdrawal |
During 12/1949 off New England (NWE) |
Service Life |
51 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1898 |
NWE |
|
New England |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
12/1949 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BOS |
Boston |
on |
08/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
NWE |
New England |
on |
14/07/1947 |
WDN |
NWE |
New England |
on |
05/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1898 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1311 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 759 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4311 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2128 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - New England (NWE) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62128 but not taken up |
|
|
12/1949 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2128 from New England (NWE) |
|
|