Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 504 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14547 Week
» 79501 Month
» 282165 Year
» 3309018 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1359 |
m/e |
12/1899 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4359 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) |
2148 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
62148 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
D3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
219 |
Works Number |
870 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 12/1899 |
Withdrawal |
During 11/1950 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
ALLOC |
STV |
Staveley (G.C.) |
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
ALLOC |
CLK |
Colwick |
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1950 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1899 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1359 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 870 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4359 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2148 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 62148 but not taken up |
|
|
14/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
10/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
24/09/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
11/1950 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2148 |
|
|