Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 4155 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23066 Week
» 88020 Month
» 290684 Year
» 3317537 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D140 |
25/11/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
46003 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
46 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box split in two |
|
To Service |
25/11/1961 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
05/10/1978 off Laira (LA) |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 03/1980 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams |
25/11/1961 |
GNP |
All over green with broad white band along lower bodyside between the cab doors. |
25/11/1961 |
GSYP |
Green with small yellow panels and white bodyside band at base of body. |
by 31/12/1962 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1968 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
04/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
04/1973 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D140 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Derby (17A) Livery applied: Green with light grey skirting, red bufferbeams |
|
|
05/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
07/07/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
12/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16D) |
|
|
16/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
20/02/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
25/06/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (84A) |
|
|
04/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 46003 |
|
|
05/10/1978 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 46003 |
|
|
03/1980 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|