Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 173 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17976 Week
» 70992 Month
» 190519 Year
» 3217372 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15106 |
09/07/1948 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1948 |
|
No train brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1948 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 15106 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ryecroft (Walsall) (2G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
26/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15106 |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|