Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3107 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16513 Week
» 69529 Month
» 189056 Year
» 3215909 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1511 |
28/02/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47412 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
28/02/1963 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 01/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
21/11/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/02/1963 |
vd |
Vacuum brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
Webb |
21/11/1969 |
xd |
Dual brakes, Dual heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
17/09/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/02/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1511 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 353 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
21/11/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
13/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47412 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
12/10/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP) |
|
|
05/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
12/05/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47412 |
|
|
13/03/1992 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|