Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1050 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18853 Week
» 71869 Month
» 191396 Year
» 3218249 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
1 |
30/09/1937 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15201 |
19/06/1951 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/09/1937 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/09/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway number D1 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
19/06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15201 |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
19/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15201 |
|
|
09/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |
|
|