Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18241 Week
» 71257 Month
» 190784 Year
» 3217637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
|
3 |
31/10/1937 |
|
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15203 |
05/1950 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
31/10/1937 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway number D3 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation dnapshot - Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 15203 |
|
|
30/04/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (Used to shunt Acton yard) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15203 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|