Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 244 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3276 Week
» 21328 Month
» 254248 Year
» 1919624 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15214 07/05/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1207/05/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 07/05/1949 to Norwood Junction (NORW)
Withdrawn 10/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 05/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
NORW Norwood Junction (New) w/e 07/05/1949
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959
73C Hither Green 4w/e 05/03/1962
73F Ashford Chart Leacon 2w/e 25/02/1971
   Withdrawn on 10/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
07/05/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15214
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Norwood Junction (NORW)
   
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
25/02/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15214    
05/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev