Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 220 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4197 Week
» 15434 Month
» 248354 Year
» 1913730 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15217 18/06/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1218/06/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 18/06/1949 to Norwood Junction (NORW)
Withdrawn 08/1970
Time in Service 21 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys
Cut Up 07/1971
Cut At British Rail (at Selhurst MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
NORW Norwood Junction (New) w/e 18/06/1949
73C Hither Green 3w/e 09/05/1955
70C Guildford 7w/e 08/10/1957
73C Hither Green 4w/e 24/02/1958
73C Hither Green 4w/e 05/04/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1970


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15217
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Norwood Junction (NORW)
   
09/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as 15217    
07/1971 Scrapped Broken up by British Rail: at Selhurst MPD    

prev prev