Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 216 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3248 Week
» 21300 Month
» 254220 Year
» 1919596 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15218 02/07/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1202/07/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 02/07/1949
Withdrawn 31/01/1970
Time in Service 20 yrs, 6 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1970
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 02/07/1949
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 19/03/1952
73C Hither Green 9w/e 08/02/1955
   Withdrawn on 31/01/1970


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
02/07/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15218
Built at Ashford Works
   
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
31/01/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as 15218    
01/08/1970 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev