Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 118 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3631 Week
» 23924 Month
» 201828 Year
» 1867204 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15219 09/07/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1209/07/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 09/07/1949
Withdrawn 31/10/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 09/07/1949
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 19/03/1952
73C Hither Green 9w/e 08/02/1955
73F Ashford 4w/e 28/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 31/10/1971


Works Visits
Where Repaired Date Stopped Days Since Last Stopped Works Entry Departure Class of Repair Waiting Repair Decision Waiting Works On Works Total Duration Cost of Repair Mileage Notes
Eastleigh Works 28/04/1960 n/a 28/04/1960 11/06/1960 Heavy Intermediate       45 days   140,074 Mileage since last General

Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
09/07/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15219
Built at Ashford Works
   
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
08/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
28/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/04/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960.
Stopped on 28/04/1960
   
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
31/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15219    
01/05/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev