Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 202 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3234 Week
» 21286 Month
» 254206 Year
» 1919582 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15222 03/09/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1203/09/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 03/09/1949
Withdrawn 31/10/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys
Cut Up 01/09/1978
Cut At John Williams Ltd (Kidwelly)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 03/09/1949
73F Ashford 4w/e 01/05/1962
73C Hither Green m/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn on 31/10/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
03/09/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15222
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
31/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15222    
01/09/1978 Scrapped Broken up by John Williams Ltd: Kidwelly    

prev prev