Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 51 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4966 Week
» 16203 Month
» 249123 Year
» 1914499 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15223 01/10/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1201/10/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 01/10/1949 to Hither Green (HIT)
Withdrawn 09/06/1969
Time in Service 19 yrs, 8 mths , 8 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1970
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
HIT Hither Green (New) w/e 01/10/1949
73E Faversham m/e 09/12/1963
73F Ashford m/e 27/01/1964
   Withdrawn on 09/06/1969


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
01/10/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15223
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Hither Green (HIT)
   
09/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
27/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (73F)    
09/06/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as 15223    
01/07/1970 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev