Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 321 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4298 Week
» 15535 Month
» 248455 Year
» 1913831 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15224 22/10/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1222/10/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 22/10/1949 to Hither Green (HIT)
Withdrawn 31/10/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs , 9 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
HIT Hither Green (New) w/e 22/10/1949
74A Ashford 4w/e 24/02/1958
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 28/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 31/10/1971

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
22/10/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15224
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Hither Green (HIT )
   
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
28/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
31/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15224    

prev prev