Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 275 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4252 Week
» 15489 Month
» 248409 Year
» 1913785 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15225 09/11/1949  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
1209/11/1949
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
To Service 09/11/1949
Withdrawn 31/10/1971
Time in Service 21 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
  (New) w/e 09/11/1949
74A Ashford 4w/e 24/02/1958
75C Norwood Junction 4w/e 01/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 31/10/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
09/11/1949 To Service To service as British Railways Number 15225
Built at Ashford Works
   
24/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
01/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
31/10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15225    
01/04/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev