Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2913 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16319 Week
» 69335 Month
» 188862 Year
» 3215715 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1530 |
15/07/1963 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47008 |
05/01/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
15/07/1963 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
01/1968 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 07/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
31/12/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
11/1981 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/07/1963 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
31/12/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1981 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
23/12/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/07/1963 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1530 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 423 Allocated to Finsbury Park (34G) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
31/12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
05/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47008 |
|
|
07/12/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
11/1981 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
17/10/1989 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47008 |
|
|
03/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: at Stratford MPD |
|
|