Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 220 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3252 Week
» 21304 Month
» 254224 Year
» 1919600 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 1629 on 01/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 16xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 381
To Service Thu 01/09/1950 to Cardiff Cathays (88A)
Withdrawal Thu 30/06/1960
Service Life 9 yrs, 9 mths , 29 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
88A   Cardiff Cathays (New) on 01/09/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 09/09/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/11/1950
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 30/11/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 02/12/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/12/1950
85A   Worcester 4w/e 05/09/1953
     Withdrawn on 30/06/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 09/09/1950
NEW NYA   m/e 30/09/1950
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 05/09/1953
WDN   m/e 30/06/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/02/1961 Swindon Works (Works Yard) Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/09/1950 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 1629
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)
   
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
05/09/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
30/06/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 1629    
03/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev