06/05/1951 |
Swindon Works |
1646 just out, 8470 (YE Co. 2463/51) 9446 (RSH 7583/51) just delivered. Under construction: 1647 (boiler 1547 QA), 1649 (boiler 1549 QA). Frames of 75001 set up, those of 75002 awaiting erection. New tender, BR Type 2, No. 824/51, allocated to 75000. Withdrawals: 1925, the last saddle, had just arrived, 1993, 2026, 2936/47, (2947 was the only remaining 'Court' without out-side steam pipes); 3447/51 (3451 had been withdrawn from store) 4018/41/58. Being cut up in 'C' shop were, 1917, 2192, 4055. Recent top feed boilers observed: 5413, 5736, 4603, 9715/40. Outside steam pipes fitted: 2878, 6393, 7301. Experimental tests: 7916, still undergoing tests of mechanical lubricators, was in the barn, while 43094, with blast pipe modifications, was on the testing plant. Other observations: 5922 has now lost her electric lighting equipment. Of the 94XX received' from outside contractors, 8470 an 9444 were the first of their respective batches to have the red-backed number plates. Bagnalls have not delivered anything further since 8429, and it is believed that they are taking a three months' respite, in order to catch up on industrial and foreign orders. |
SLS/195107 |
29/01/1957 |
London Midland Region Notes |
Nos. 10000 an 10001 and 10201 an 10202 were noted working the 'Royal Scot' through Preston during the week 22nd-29th January. On 1st February, Eu50000 and Trailer u56000 with Dynamometer Car returned from tests on the Carlisle-Newcastle line. On 8th February a most unusual engine, 1646 (84J) was noted at the rear of a freight train, en route to Inverness. Diesel Unit Mu79184 noted going north-possibly for trials on the Newcastle-Carlisle line. |
SLS/195703 |
17/05/1958 |
Helmsdale MPD |
WR 1649 is transferred on loan as a replacement for 1646, which is due for shopping at Swindon. (? What is roster for this loco.). |
SLS/195808 |
03/06/1961 |
Inverness MPD |
The two W.R. pannier tanks (1646/9) are still in Inverness shed whilst 55199 is still on pilot work at Inverness station; 54466 is still pilot at Dingwall relieved by 55269. Stored at Millburn sidings are- 54463/91/3, 55216, 56305, 57585/94. |
SLS/196107 |
29/06/1961 |
Highland line |
With dieselisation of the Thurso branch on Thursday, 29th June, steam haulage north of Helmsdale ceased, although 54482 re-appeared on the branch on 8th July. D5324 was noted on it on 3rd July. Congestion at Inverness on Summer Saturdays is always acute and is made worse by pigeon traffic and station turn-round time being exceeded. Double-heading is necessary between Inverness and Wick on all overweight trains but even so the 6-40 a.m. ex Inverness is a tough proposition-on 1st July it was 445 tone north of Helmsdale and on 15th July consisted of 14 vehicles although relieved by a 5-05 a.m. special. Both were about 1 hour late. Helmsdale shed stables only the diesel workings introduced at Summer t.t. and a 60% train-crew cut has taken place. All the ex-Helmsdale engines are working from Inverness except 54495 which was Dingwall pilot on 3rd July (replacing 54487), 57587 being on station pilot duties and 1646/9 in the yards. 40150 an 54482 were on Wick shed on 3rd July, spare. The diesels noted north of Inverness were mainly 53XX or 51XX. |
SLS/196108 |
12/08/1961 |
Inverness MPD |
Steam locomotives on Inverness on 12th August were 1646, 40150, 57587 on pilot duties, 54463/91/3, 55216/36, 56305 an 57585 in store. |
SLS/196109 |
16/04/1962 |
Highland section |
Dismantling of the Fortrose and Dornoch branches commenced on 16th April and a diesel works as required from Inverness to Muir of Ord in connection with work on the former branch. The Dornoch branch is worked as a private siding. The down side sidings and branch water tank at The Mound have been removed already. Helmsdale shed has lost its roof and Blair Atholl shed is now disconnected (a Standard tank works the Aberfeldy branch). Inverness shed is now closed from public road and work is performed at Loch Gorm; the only steam engines on shed at end of April were 1646, 44784, 54466, 54482, 54495, 55269 and HR 103. The only steam loco. north thereof was 1649 at Dingwall. |
SLS/196206 |