Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 299 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4276 Week
» 15513 Month
» 248433 Year
» 1913809 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 1661 on 31/03/1955

Locomotive Specifics
Designer F. Hawksworth
Class 16xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 417
To Service Mon 31/03/1955 to Kidderminster (85D)
Withdrawal Mon 13/07/1964
Service Life 9 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
85D   Kidderminster (New) on 31/03/1955
85A   Worcester 4w/e 02/11/1957
     Withdrawn on 13/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW NYA   m/e 31/03/1955
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 02/11/1957
WDN   3w/e 20/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
31/03/1955 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 1661
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Kidderminster (85D)
   
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
13/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 1661    
12/1964 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev