Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3921 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22832 Week
» 87786 Month
» 290450 Year
» 3317303 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
1662 |
on |
10/03/1955 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
F. Hawksworth |
Class |
16xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
417 |
To Service |
Sat 10/03/1955 to Worcester (85A) |
Withdrawal |
Sat 28/12/1963 |
Service Life |
8 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys |
Total Mileage |
138,017 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
NEW |
NYA |
|
m/e |
31/03/1955 |
ALLOC |
87G |
Carmarthen |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
ALLOC |
85C |
Hereford |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
31/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/03/1955 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 1662 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Worcester (85A) |
|
|
03/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G) |
|
|
01/12/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hereford (85C) |
|
|
28/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 1662 |
|
|
04/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|