Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 2294 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15700 Week
» 68716 Month
» 188243 Year
» 3215096 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1733 |
12/06/1964 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47141 |
02/02/1974 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47614 |
03/07/1984 |
|
TOPS (47/8) |
47853 |
20/03/1990 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BSYP |
Experimental XP64 livery of turquoise blue with small yellow panels on front, with white BR double-arrow symbol on a red panel under each cab side window |
12/06/1964 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 04/1970 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 30/12/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
09/1972 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
by 11/1977 |
|
Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1964 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
09/1972 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1964 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1733 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 495 Allocated to Old Oak Common (81A) Livery applied: Experimental XP64 livery of turquoise blue with small yellow panels on front, with white BR double-arrow symbol on a red panel under each cab side window |
|
|
14/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
16/03/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
04/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
04/04/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
06/03/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) |
|
|
09/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
24/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47141 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
21/06/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
29/05/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (ED) |
|
|
11/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Modified headcode box (black blinds with 2 marker lights) |
|
|
03/07/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47614 |
|
|
20/03/1990 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47853 |
|
|