Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1088 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19999 Week
» 84953 Month
» 287617 Year
» 3314470 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1830 |
18/03/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/3) |
47349 |
16/10/1973 |
|
TOPS (57/6) |
57603 |
31/12/2003 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
18/03/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
02/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/03/1965 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
|
Webb |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/03/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1830 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 592 Allocated to Nottingham Division (D16) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Two tone green with full yellow ends |
|
|
04/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
07/01/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
22/07/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CE) |
|
|
16/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47349 |
|
|
31/12/2003 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 57603 |
|
|