Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D1925 |
22/12/1965 |
|
TOPS (47/0) |
47248 |
24/11/1973 |
|
TOPS (47/4) |
47616 |
28/06/1984 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
22/12/1965 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/1977 |
|
Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
|
Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1965 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
Webb |
02/1977 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 12/1977 |
xo |
Dual brakes, No heat |
|
lX |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1965 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D1925 Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough, Works Number 687 Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) Livery applied: Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
09/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (70D) |
|
|
09/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
24/11/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47248 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Western Region AWS (ATC) removed |
|
|
12/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler removed |
|
|
28/06/1984 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 47616 |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
01/01/2004 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 47616 |
|
|
05/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury |
|
|