Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 157 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17960 Week
» 70976 Month
» 190503 Year
» 3217356 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2044 |
29/11/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03044 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/11/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/11/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2044 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
20/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03044 |
|
|
21/01/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03044 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|