Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 484 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19395 Week
» 84349 Month
» 287013 Year
» 3313866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2059 |
29/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03059 |
26/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
29/05/1959 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
05/07/1987 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Cut Up |
on 24/10/1990 |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2059 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
26/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03059 |
|
|
05/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03059 |
|
|
24/10/1990 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|