Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1373 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19176 Week
» 72192 Month
» 191719 Year
» 3218572 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2071 |
13/10/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2071 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manningham (55F) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/05/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2071 from Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|