Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 127 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17930 Week
» 70946 Month
» 190473 Year
» 3217326 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D208 |
27/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40008 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
27/08/1958 to Hornsey (34B) |
Withdrawn |
14/11/1982 |
Time in Service |
24 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1988 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Loco due E exam,bogies donated to 40033 |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
27/08/1958 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/08/1958 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D208 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Hornsey (34B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
30/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
07/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
23/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/11/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
03/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
05/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
11/07/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
07/11/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40008 |
|
|
14/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40008 |
|
|
06/1988 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|