Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 85 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6012 Week
» 4750 Month
» 419071 Year
» 1640636 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2092 27/05/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 03092 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0327/05/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 27/05/1960 to Percy Main (52E)
Withdrawn 31/08/1977
Time in Service 17 yrs, 3 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
52E Percy Main (New) on 27/05/1960
52G Sunderland w/e 17/09/1960
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 22/05/1965
30E Colchester w/e 08/05/1971
   Withdrawn on 31/08/1977


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
27/05/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number D2092
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Percy Main (52E)
   
17/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
22/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03092 (Tops)    
31/08/1977 Withdrawn Condemned as 03092    
01/01/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev