Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 332 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4309 Week
» 15546 Month
» 248466 Year
» 1913842 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2101 m/e 01/1902

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Dean
Class 2021
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2101 Saddle Tank01/1902
2021/2101 Pannier Tank (0-6-0PT)02/1918
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
To Service During 01/1902
Withdrawal Mon 12/03/1956
Service Life 54 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys
Total Mileage 1,055,659
Information Arrived at Swindon for cutting 24/3/1956

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 21/04/1956 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1902
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 08/09/1951
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 30/09/1951
85A   Worcester 4w/e 16/05/1953
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 03/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 12/03/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 24/03/1951
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 30/09/1953
LOAN 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 03/10/1953
WDN   w/e 17/03/1956
WDN   m/e 31/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Rebuilt with pannier tanks
02/1918 Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
08/1923 Diagram BR0 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)
08/1931 Diagram B4 boiler fitted (Belpaire firebox)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1959 Brecon demotion Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. SLS/196002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1902 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2101
Built at Wolverhampton Works (Stafford Road)
   
02/1918 Modification Diagram B4 boiler fitted    
02/1918 Modification Modification: Rebuilt with pannier tanks    
08/1923 Modification Diagram BR0 boiler fitted    
08/1931 Modification Diagram B4 boiler fitted    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
12/03/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 2101    
21/04/1956 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev