Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4296 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17702 Week
» 70718 Month
» 190245 Year
» 3217098 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2116 |
21/08/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2116 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C) |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2116 |
|
|
07/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Marples and Gillot: Sheffield |
|
|